WI AB286 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 103.10 (1) (a) 1., 103.10 (1) (a) 2. and 103.10 (14) (b); to renumber 103.10 (14) (a); to renumber and amend 103.10 (1) (a) (intro.); to amend 103.10 (1) (b), 103.10 (1) (c), 103.10 (1m) (b) 4., 103.10 (3) (a) 1., 103.10 (3) (b) 3., 103.10 (6) (b) (intro.), 103.10 (6) (b) 1., 103.10 (7) (a), 103.10 (7) (b) (intro.), 103.10 (7) (b) 1., 103.10 (12) (c), 111.322 (2m) (a) and 111.322 (2m) (b); and to create 20.445 (1) (w), 25.17 (1) (er), 25.52, 71.05 (6) (b) 53., 103.10 (1) (ap), 103.10 (1) (dm), 103.10 (1) (dp), 103.10 (1) (gm), 103.10 (3) (b) 4., 103.10 (6) (c), 103.10 (7) (d) and 103.105 of the statutes; Relating to: the establishment of a family and medical leave insurance program; family leave to care for a grandparent, grandchild, or sibling and for the active duty of a family member; the employers that are required to permit an employee to take family or medical leave; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; granting rule-making authority; making an appropriation; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The establishment of a family and medical leave insurance program; family leave to care for a grandparent, grandchild, or sibling and for the active duty of a family member; the employers that are required to permit an employee to take family or medical leave; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; granting rule-making authority; making an appropriation; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Family Law and take up (Y: 34 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Family Law and take up, Ayes 34, Noes 59 |
2017-07-12 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2017-05-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced |