WI AB270 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 146.89 (1) (r) 5. to 13. and 146.89 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: additional providers in the volunteer health care provider program and proof of financial responsibility and malpractice insurance requirements for certain advanced practice nurses serving as volunteer health care providers. (FE)
Title
Additional providers in the volunteer health care provider program and proof of financial responsibility and malpractice insurance requirements for certain advanced practice nurses serving as volunteer health care providers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 344 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-31-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-10-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | House | Representatives Hintz and Hulsey added as coauthors |
2013-10-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-10-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-10-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-10-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-10-15 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-15 | House | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 10-15-2013 |
2013-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-14 | House | Representative Strachota added as a coauthor |
2013-10-10 | House | Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2013-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2013-10-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-10-10 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-10-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-09-27 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2013-09-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing |
2013-08-01 | House | Introduced |