WI AB234 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 77.92 (4); and to create 71.07 (5c), 71.10 (4) (cr), 71.28 (5c), 71.30 (3) (dr), 71.47 (5c) and 71.49 (1) (cr) of the statutes; relating to: an income and franchise tax for hiring certain individuals.
Title
An income and franchise tax for hiring certain individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-05-12 | Public hearing held | |
2009-05-05 | Representative Lothian withdrawn as a coauthor | |
2009-04-29 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Jobs, the Economy and Small Business | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab234 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB234.pdf |