WI AB230 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 218.10 (8m), 340.01 (6m), 340.01 (18m), 340.01 (48r), 341.25 (1) (i), 348.08 (1) (i) and 348.08 (1) (j); and to create 218.10 (1b), 218.10 (1c), 218.10 (1d), 218.10 (1i), 218.10 (1n), 218.10 (1o), 218.10 (1p), 218.10 (1q), 218.10 (1t), 218.10 (2), 218.10 (7m), 218.10 (7w), 218.10 (8u), 218.10 (8v), 218.10 (8w), 218.10 (10), 218.10 (11), 218.161, 218.162, 218.163, 218.164, 218.165, 218.166, 218.167 and 218.17 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: recreational vehicle manufacturers, distributors, and dealers, the definition of recreational vehicles, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Recreational vehicle manufacturers, distributors, and dealers, the definition of recreational vehicles, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 164 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-21-2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-25 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2024-01-25 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:11 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2024-01-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug |
2024-01-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug |
2023-05-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Donovan added as a coauthor |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |