WI AB228 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 51.15 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: excluding time for evaluation and treatment of certain medical conditions from the time limit for emergency detention without a hearing.
Title
Excluding time for evaluation and treatment of certain medical conditions from the time limit for emergency detention without a hearing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-11-15 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-05-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2021-04-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-06 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2021-03-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced |