WI AB226 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.52 (13) and 77.53 (10); and to create 77.51 (3h), 77.51 (3pq), 77.51 (4f), 77.54 (70), 100.30 (2) (ci), 100.30 (2) (ck), 100.30 (2) (ckc) and 100.30 (6) (a) 10. of the statutes; Relating to: exemptions to the sale of diapers and feminine hygiene products. (FE)
Title
Exemptions to the sale of diapers and feminine hygiene products. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-08-29 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2023-08-09 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-07-13 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-05-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |