WI AB214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 165.77 (7) and 175.405; to amend 165.845 (title), 165.845 (1) (a), 165.845 (1) (b) and 165.845 (2); and to create 165.775, 165.845 (1) (d) and 895.537 of the statutes; Relating to: storage and processing of sexual assault kits and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Storage and processing of sexual assault kits and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-04 | House | Representative Anderson added as a coauthor |
2019-12-03 | House | Representatives Vruwink, Haywood and Crowley added as coauthors |
2019-11-26 | House | Representative McGuire added as a coauthor |
2019-11-25 | House | Representatives Kolste, Stubbs and Hebl added as coauthors |
2019-11-21 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor |
2019-11-20 | House | Representatives Hesselbein, Goyke, Billings and Hintz added as coauthors |
2019-11-19 | House | Representatives Riemer, Stuck and Milroy added as coauthors |
2019-11-13 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2019-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-30 | House | Representative Fields added as a coauthor |
2019-05-28 | House | Representatives Neubauer and Zimmerman added as coauthors |
2019-05-22 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2019-05-17 | House | Representative Gruszynski added as a coauthor |
2019-05-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab214 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB214.pdf |