WI AB205 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.094 (1) (b); to amend 440.08 (2) (a) (intro.), 440.094 (title), (1) (c) (intro.), 3., 4. and 5. and (2) and 440.094 (3); and to create 440.094 (1) (c) 9g., 9m., 17. and 19., (d), (e) and (f) and 440.094 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: practice of certain professions by credential holders from other states. (FE)
Title
Practice of certain professions by credential holders from other states. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-06-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-07 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 34, Paired 2 |
2023-06-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-06-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-06-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-06-07 | House | Read a second time |
2023-06-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2023-06-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-06-01 | House | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-06-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-06-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2023-06-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2023-05-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2023-05-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |