WI AB194 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Published 5-25-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Published 5-25-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.07 (3) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: the prohibition against underage persons being present on alcohol licensed premises.
Title
The prohibition against underage persons being present on alcohol licensed premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Published 5-25-2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 5-24-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 7 |
2017-05-23 | House | Presented to the Governor on 5-23-2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-23-2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | House | Representative Schraa added as a coauthor |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced |