WI AB191 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.159 (1) (a) (intro.) and 49.36 (3) (a); and to create 20.435 (4) (bq), 20.437 (2) (em), 49.162, 49.163 (2) (am) 7., 49.36 (3m) and 49.79 (9) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring drug testing and treatment for eligibility for certain work experience programs; requiring the Department of Health Services to request a waiver to screen and, if indicated, test and provide treatment to FoodShare employment and training participants for illegal use of a controlled substance; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Requiring drug testing and treatment for eligibility for certain work experience programs; requiring the Department of Health Services to request a waiver to screen and, if indicated, test and provide treatment to FoodShare employment and training participants for illegal use of a controlled substance; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 14 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 14 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-06-09 | House | Messaged pursuant to Assembly Rule 50 (1) |
2015-05-13 | House | Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged, Ayes 63, Noes 32 |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 14 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 14 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-13 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2015-05-13 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2015-05-13 | House | Point of order that Assembly Amendment 13 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2015-05-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 13 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a second time |
2015-05-12 | House | Emergency statement attached by Governor pursuant to s. 16.47(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 12 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 11 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 10 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 9 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 8 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 offered by Representatives Kolste, Jorgensen, Goyke, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Subeck, Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste and Spreitzer |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Goyke, Jorgensen, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-05-05 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Jorgensen, Goyke, Kolste, Spreitzer and Subeck |
2015-04-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-29 | House | LRB correction |
2015-04-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2015-04-24 | House | Introduced |