WI AB189 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 979.01 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring notification to the medical examiner or coroner of any death that occurs within 24 hours of presentment at or admission to certain facilities.
Title
Requiring notification to the medical examiner or coroner of any death that occurs within 24 hours of presentment at or admission to certain facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2023-10-19 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2023-10-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rozar |
2023-08-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |