WI AB176 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0501 (1); and to create 66.0501 (1) (b) and 165.85 (4) (a) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: appointment of certain lawfully present aliens as law enforcement officers.
Title
Appointment of certain lawfully present aliens as law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:05 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Shelton added as a coauthor |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2022-01-24 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2021-06-25 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2021-06-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-17 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-06-14 | House | Representatives Conley and Stubbs added as coauthors |
2021-06-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-10 | House | Representatives Drake and Emerson added as coauthors |
2021-03-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced |