WI AB172 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.05 (5s) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: publication of Elections Commission meeting minutes.
Title
Publication of Elections Commission meeting minutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-05-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Neylon |
2021-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced |