WI AB169 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.227 (15) (a) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: membership of the Agricultural Education and Workforce Development Council in the Department of Workforce Development.
Title
Membership of the Agricultural Education and Workforce Development Council in the Department of Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] |
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-01-25 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2024-01-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:07 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2023-11-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-03 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2023-11-03 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2023-11-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-08-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities |
2023-04-10 | House | Introduced |