WI AB165 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 175.49 (3) (title), (a) (intro.), 1., 2. and 4., (b) and (c), 175.49 (5) and 941.23 (3) (b) 2. a.; and to create 175.49 (1) (em) of the statutes; Relating to: certification cards to carry concealed weapons for residents of Wisconsin who formerly were employed as law enforcement officers in another state. (FE)
Title
Certification cards to carry concealed weapons for residents of Wisconsin who formerly were employed as law enforcement officers in another state. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-05 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-05 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-11-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-05 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-05 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-10-31 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2013-09-12 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and referred to committee on Criminal Justice pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2013-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab165 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB165.pdf |