WI AB165 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal and recreate 94.643 (4) of the statutes; relating to: the display of turf fertilizer containing phosphorus.
Title
The display of turf fertilizer containing phosphorus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-25 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-10-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-18 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 55, Noes 41, Paired 2 |
2011-10-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-18 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-18 | House | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 37 |
2011-10-18 | House | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hulsey, C. Taylor, Bernard Schaber, Berceau, Ringhand, Pasch, Pope-Roberts, Molepske Jr, Clark, Danou, Seidel, Zamarripa, Roys, Kessler, Richards, D. Cullen, Toles and E. Coggs |
2011-10-18 | House | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 37 |
2011-10-18 | House | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hulsey, C. Taylor, Kessler, Ringhand, D. Cullen, Pope-Roberts, E. Coggs, Seidel, Bernard Schaber, Roys, Richards, Berceau and Zamarripa |
2011-10-18 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-12 | House | Placed on calendar 10-18-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-03 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2011-10-03 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 13, Noes 2 |
2011-09-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-09-26 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Knilans |
2011-09-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-05-31 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources |
2011-05-31 | House | Introduced |