WI AB163 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-11)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-11)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 230.35 (4) (a) 10., 230.35 (4) (c) and 230.35 (4) (d) (intro.); and to create 230.35 (4) (a) 5m. of the statutes; Relating to: the establishment of November 11 as a day on which the offices of the agencies of state government are closed. (FE)
Title
The establishment of November 11 as a day on which the offices of the agencies of state government are closed. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2017-05-23 | House | Representative VanderMeer added as a coauthor |
2017-04-27 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab163 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB163.pdf |