WI AB158 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 85.65 of the statutes; Relating to: ratification of the Driver License Compact. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the Driver License Compact. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-17 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-14 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-05-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-12 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-04-10 | House | Introduced |