WI AB15 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Published 5-18-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Published 5-18-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 108.04 (1) (a) (intro.), 108.04 (1) (b) 1., 108.04 (2) (a) 1., 108.04 (2) (a) 2., 108.04 (2) (a) 3. (intro.), 108.04 (2) (bm), 108.05 (1) (q) (intro.), 108.05 (3) (a), 108.05 (3) (c) (intro.) and 108.05 (3) (dm) (intro.); and to create 108.062 of the statutes; Relating to: payment of unemployment insurance benefits under a work-sharing program. (FE)
Title
Payment of unemployment insurance benefits under a work-sharing program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Senate Organization (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Senate Organization (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Published 5-18-2013 |
2013-05-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 5-17-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 11 |
2013-05-16 | House | Presented to the Governor on 5-16-2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-11-2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Refused to refer to committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 15, Noes 18 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read a third time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 17, Noes 15 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Lassa, C. Larson, Risser, Wirch, T. Cullen, Miller, Lehman, Shilling, Harris, Vinehout, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Hansen and L. Taylor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-9-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Lehman and Jauch |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-03-06 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-03-06 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 74, Noes 22 |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-03-06 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 37 |
2013-03-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-03-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 37 |
2013-03-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 37 |
2013-03-06 | House | Read a second time |
2013-03-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sinicki |
2013-03-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki, Kahl, Ringhand, Barca, Wachs, Bernard Schaber, Shankland, Hulsey, Vruwink, Richards, Pope, Bewley, Hebl, Barnes, Johnson, Riemer, Sargent, Billings, Wright, Goyke and Kolste |
2013-03-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Sinicki, Ringhand, Kahl, Wachs, Bernard Schaber, Shankland, Hulsey, Vruwink, Richards, Barca, Pope, Bewley, Hebl, Barnes, Johnson, Riemer, Sargent, Billings, Wright, Kolste and Goyke |
2013-03-01 | House | Emergency statement attached by Governor pursuant to s. 16.47(2) Wisconsin Statutes |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to calendar of 3-6-2013 |
2013-03-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 10, Noes 6 |
2013-03-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2013-02-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-02-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Shankland |
2013-02-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2013-02-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-20 | House | Representative Murtha added as a coauthor |
2013-02-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-02-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced |