WI AB135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 941.295 (2) (d) 1.; and to create 941.295 (2g) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: going armed with an electric weapon by private security personnel.
Title
Going armed with an electric weapon by private security personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Published 2-6-2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-5-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 87 |
2020-02-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2020 |
2020-01-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-24-2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-05-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |