WI AB123 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 145.245 (10m) of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 59, section 9439 (4t); Relating to: the private on-site wastewater treatment system replacement or rehabilitation grant program and a septage characterization study. (FE)
Title
The private on-site wastewater treatment system replacement or rehabilitation grant program and a septage characterization study. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-22 | House | Representative Milroy added as a coauthor |
2021-06-22 | House | LRB correction |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced |