WI AB121 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 145.02 (2); to amend 101.63 (1) (intro.) and 101.82 (1); and to create 145.02 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: standards for the construction and inspection of camping units; for installing, repairing, and maintaining electrical wiring in camping units; and for plumbing in camping units; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Standards for the construction and inspection of camping units; for installing, repairing, and maintaining electrical wiring in camping units; and for plumbing in camping units; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2015-05-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ripp |
2015-04-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab121 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB121.pdf |