WI AB115 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Representative J. Anderson added as a coauthor
Pending: House Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Representative J. Anderson added as a coauthor
Pending: House Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 102.17 (9) (a) 1.; to amend 102.17 (9) (b) (intro.); and to create 102.17 (9) (a) 1c., 102.17 (9) (a) 1e., 102.17 (9) (a) 1g. and 102.17 (9) (a) 1p. of the statutes; Relating to: changing the conditions of liability for worker's compensation benefits for emergency medical responders, emergency medical services practitioners, volunteer fire fighters, correctional officers, emergency dispatchers, coroners and coroner staff, and medical examiners and medical examiner staff.
Title
Changing the conditions of liability for worker's compensation benefits for emergency medical responders, emergency medical services practitioners, volunteer fire fighters, correctional officers, emergency dispatchers, coroners and coroner staff, and medical examiners and medical examiner staff.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Representative J. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-09-06 | House | Representative Michalski added as a coauthor |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab115 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/AB115.pdf |