WI AB11 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 27.01 (9) (bn) (title); and to create 20.370 (1) (ed), 27.01 (6m) and 27.01 (9) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: fee waivers for state park vehicle admission receipts to parents or guardians of 4th grade pupils and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Fee waivers for state park vehicle admission receipts to parents or guardians of 4th grade pupils and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-09-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-09-27 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2023-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-06-08 | House | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2023-05-02 | House | Representative Billings added as a coauthor |
2023-04-27 | House | Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor |
2023-03-20 | House | Representative Bare added as a coauthor |
2023-02-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-15 | House | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor |
2023-02-10 | House | Representative Madison added as a coauthor |
2023-02-09 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced |