WI AB105 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: exclusion of certain military allowances in determining gross income for purposes of child support.
Title
Exclusion of certain military allowances in determining gross income for purposes of child support.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-04 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and referred to committee on Family Law pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2021-04-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced |