WI AB105 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 111.70 (3) (a) 8. and 9. and 111.70 (3) (b) 7. of the statutes; relating to: arbitration and fair-share agreements during collective bargaining negotiations under the Municipal Employment Relations Act.
Title
Arbitration and fair-share agreements during collective bargaining negotiations under the Municipal Employment Relations Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-04-28 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on calendar 4-28-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-04-23 | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | |
2009-04-16 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-08 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-12 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab105 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB105.pdf |