WI AB1022 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (6) (am) 2. d.; and to create 71.07 (6) (am) 2. e. of the statutes; Relating to: the married persons credit. (FE)
Title
The married persons credit. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2024-05-14 | House | Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-03-01 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-1-2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-27-2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-21-2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | House | Representative Brooks added as a coauthor |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 34 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced |