WI AB102 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (6e) (a) 2. b. and 71.07 (6e) (a) 3. d.; and to create 71.07 (6e) (c) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: reducing the eligibility threshold to claim the veterans and surviving spouses property tax credit. (FE)
Title
Reducing the eligibility threshold to claim the veterans and surviving spouses property tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:05 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Edming |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-10-23 | House | Representative Shelton added as a coauthor |
2023-08-22 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2023-07-19 | House | Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor |
2023-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-27 | House | Representatives Rettinger and C. Anderson added as coauthors |
2023-04-26 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-26 | House | Representatives Palmeri, Joers, Bare and Steffen added as coauthors |
2023-04-13 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2023-04-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-04-10 | House | Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor |
2023-03-30 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-03-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-03-20 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2023-03-17 | House | Representative Riemer added as a coauthor |
2023-03-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-10 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduced |