WI AB1013 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-17)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-17)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.435 (4) (bt); and to create 49.79 (7w) of the statutes; Relating to: healthy food incentive program. (FE)
Title
Healthy food incentive program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 201 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-13-2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 2 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Joers and Hurd |
2024-02-05 | House | Representative Riemer added as a coauthor |
2024-02-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced |