WI AB1005 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 5.84 (1) and 7.315 (2); to renumber and amend 6.50 (3); to amend 5.056, 5.40 (7), 7.08 (1) (a), 7.08 (1) (c), 7.15 (1m), 85.61 (1) and 301.03 (20m); and to create 5.057, 5.058, 5.84 (1) (b), 5.84 (3), 5.84 (4), 6.36 (1) (ae) 3., 6.50 (3) (b) and (c), 6.50 (4m), 6.78 (5), 7.15 (16), 7.23 (1) (jm), 7.315 (2) (b) and 69.03 (16) of the statutes; Relating to: maintenance of the voter registration list, training of municipal clerks, data sharing agreements, pre-election procedures, lines at the polls on election day, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Maintenance of the voter registration list, training of municipal clerks, data sharing agreements, pre-election procedures, lines at the polls on election day, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced |