WI AB1004 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0443 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring local governments to designate an individual for consultation required under a federal program regarding refugee resettlement and assistance. (FE)
Title
Requiring local governments to designate an individual for consultation required under a federal program regarding refugee resettlement and assistance. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:52 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2024-02-14 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2024-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hurd |
2024-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced |