WI AB100 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 281.58 (8) (a) 2.; and to create 281.58 (7) (b) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: funding for reduction of infiltration and inflow in connecting laterals and sewer lines. (FE)
Title
Funding for reduction of infiltration and inflow in connecting laterals and sewer lines. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-13 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2023-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-30 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-05-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-08 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-04-19 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2023-04-17 | House | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-13 | House | Representative Bodden added as a coauthor |
2023-03-10 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduced |