WI AB1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 61-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 61-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g) and 185.983 (1) (intro.); and to create 609.847 and 632.728 of the statutes; Relating to: coverage of individuals with preexisting conditions.
Title
Coverage of individuals with preexisting conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-01-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-01-22 | House | Representative Nygren added as a coauthor |
2019-01-22 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 76, Noes 19 |
2019-01-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-01-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 76, Noes 19 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 35 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Gruszynski, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, Meyers, Milroy, Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2019-01-22 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 60, Noes 35 |
2019-01-22 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2019-01-22 | House | Point of order that Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Gruszynski, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, Meyers, Milroy, Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2019-01-22 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 60, Noes 35 |
2019-01-22 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2019-01-22 | House | Point of order that Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Gruszynski, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, Meyers, Milroy, Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen |
2019-01-22 | House | Read a second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative C. Taylor |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Kolste, Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Gruszynski, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Meyers, Milroy, Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink, Zamarripa and Hintz |
2019-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Gruszynski, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, Meyers, Milroy, Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to calendar |
2019-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2019-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Rohrkaste |
2019-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen |
2019-01-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-01-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced |