WA SJR8215 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring voter approval for any action or combination of actions by the legislature that raises taxes.
Title
Requiring voter approval for any action or combination of actions by the legislature that raises taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Held at the Desk. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=8215&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Joint Resolutions/8215.pdf |