WA SJR8201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Constitution to allow a simple majority of voters voting to authorize school district bonds.
Title
Amending the Constitution to allow a simple majority of voters voting to authorize school district bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Not adopted; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Failed to receive a two-thirds majority vote. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Held on second reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:05 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR4203 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.