WA SJM8023 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Petitioning Congress to fully fund forty percent of the costs of the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA).
Title
Petitioning Congress to fully fund forty percent of the costs of the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA).
Sponsors
Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HJM4020 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.