WA SCR8402 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Convening a joint session for the purpose of receiving an address from Premier John Horgan of British Columbia.
Title
Convening a joint session for the purpose of receiving an address from Premier John Horgan of British Columbia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-02-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Third reading, adopted. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-02-04 | House | Third reading, adopted. |
2019-02-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Third reading, adopted. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |