WA SCR8401 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing cutoff dates for the consideration of legislation during the 2021 regular session of the sixty-seventh legislature.
Title
Establishing cutoff dates for the consideration of legislation during the 2021 regular session of the sixty-seventh legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2021-01-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-01-15 | House | Third reading, adopted. |
2021-01-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-01-13 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Third reading, adopted. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |