WA SCR8400 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing cutoff dates for the consideration of legislation during the 2015 regular session of the sixty-fourth legislature.
Title
Establishing cutoff dates for the consideration of legislation during the 2015 regular session of the sixty-fourth legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-01-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-01-19 | House | Third reading, adopted. |
2015-01-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-01-14 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Third reading, adopted. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |