WA SB6832 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning child welfare services.
Title
Concerning child welfare services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 291, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | ELCS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-23 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-03 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |