WA SB6749 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the transfer of commercial real estate.
Title
Concerning the transfer of commercial real estate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Chapter 64, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-15 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |