WA SB6734 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying interest rate and penalty provisions in the current use program.
Title
Modifying interest rate and penalty provisions in the current use program.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-01 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-01 | GO - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6734&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6734.pdf |