WA SB6706 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the commercialization of research at state universities.
Title
Concerning the commercialization of research at state universities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. James Kastama [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Edward Murray [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Effective date 7/13/2010. | |
2010-04-05 | Chapter 14, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-04-05 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-30 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-29 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-29 | President signed. | |
2010-03-25 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-25 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-22 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2010-03-22 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-22 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-16 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-22 | CEDT - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | CEDT - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development & Trade. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-22 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |