WA SB6623 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing host home funding restrictions.
Title
Reducing host home funding restrictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 265, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-26 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |