WA SB6582 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning local transportation revenue options.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning local transportation revenue options.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-08 Returned to Senate Rules 3.
2012-03-07 Signed by Senators Haugen, Eide; Representatives Clibborn, Armstrong, Liias.
2012-03-07 Conference committee report; received 11:45 PM 3/7/2012.
2012-03-07 Signed by Representatives Clibborn, Armstrong, Liias; Senators Haugen, Eide.
2012-03-07 Conference committee report; received 11:42 PM 3/7/2012.
2012-03-06 Conference committee appointed. Representatives Armstrong, Clibborn, Liias.
2012-03-06 Conference committee request granted.
2012-03-05 Conference committee appointed. Senators Haugen, King, Eide.
2012-03-05 Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon.
2012-03-03 Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2012-03-03 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2012-03-03 Floor amendment
2012-02-28 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2012-02-27 Referred to Rules 2 Review.
2012-02-24 Minority; do not pass.
2012-02-24 TR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2012-02-24 TR - Executive action taken by committee.
2012-02-24 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2012-02-21 Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2012-02-15 First reading, referred to Transportation.
2012-02-13 Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2012-02-13 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2012-02-13 Floor amendment
2012-02-13 1st substitute bill substituted
2012-02-09 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2012-02-07 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2012-02-07 Minority; do not pass.
2012-02-07 TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2012-02-07 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2012-02-06 Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2012-02-02 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2012-02-02 First reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback