WA SB6547 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an equitable debt service repayment plan for the Tacoma Narrows bridge.
Title
Establishing an equitable debt service repayment plan for the Tacoma Narrows bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2834 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - First reading, referred to Transportation