WA SB6527 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Incentivizing trade and economic development through state environmental policy reviews.
Title
Incentivizing trade and economic development through state environmental policy reviews.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | TRED - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6527&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6527.pdf |