WA SB6518 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring technology-based economic development programs from innovate Washington to the department of commerce.
Title
Transferring technology-based economic development programs from innovate Washington to the department of commerce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 174, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 9:00 AM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |