WA SB6513 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 3/31/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 3/31/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reservations of water.
Title
Concerning reservations of water.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 3/31/2016. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 117, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-24 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |