WA SB6498 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a testamentary privilege for alcohol or drug addiction recovery sponsors.
Title
Creating a testamentary privilege for alcohol or drug addiction recovery sponsors.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage notwithstanding Governor's Veto (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Passage notwithstanding the Governor's veto (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Passage notwithstanding the Governor's veto (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Effective date 6/28/2016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 24, 2016 Laws 1st Special Session. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2016-03-29 | House | On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 85; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2789 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.